ME LD867 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 867 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 23 In Favor and 12 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 867 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 23 In Favor and 12 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Tax Fairness and To Lower Medical Expenses for Patients under the Maine Medical Use of Marijuana Act
Title
An Act To Provide Tax Fairness and To Lower Medical Expenses for Patients under the Maine Medical Use of Marijuana Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #707 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-12 - House - Enactment RC #600 (Y: 80 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Adpt Cas-178 As Am By Sbs-505 RC #648 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Enactment RC #600 (Y: 80 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Adpt Cas-178 As Am By Sbs-505 RC #648 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | LD 867 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 23 In Favor and 12 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 600 (Yeas 80 - Nays 69 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-12 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-178) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-505) thereto |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-178) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-505) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 648 Yeas 26 - Nays 9 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-178) As Amended By Senate Amendment "B" (S-505) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-505) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-178) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules, On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-178) was ADOPTED |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-178). |
2016-04-11 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2015-07-16 | House | Carried over from the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending Enactment, in concurrence. |
2015-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-178). |
2015-06-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-178) . |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-178) READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-03-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-12 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2015-03-12 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION |