ME LD864 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Failed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide for a Statewide Contract for School Teachers
Title
An Act To Provide for a Statewide Contract for School Teachers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #351 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #353 (Y: 80 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #353 (Y: 80 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-496) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-21 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-496) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-496) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 351 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 353 (Yeas 80 - Nays 68 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-20 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |