ME LD855 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Issuance of a Birth Certificate Following a Gender Marker Change
Title
An Act Regarding the Issuance of a Birth Certificate Following a Gender Marker Change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp RC #362 (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp RC #263 (Y: 82 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp RC #263 (Y: 82 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 362 Yeas 21 - Nays 11 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Report A Ought to Pass ACCEPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 263 (Yeas 82 - Nays 56 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, REPORT A Ought to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-04-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |