ME LD855 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen the Maine Uniform Building and Energy Code
Title
An Act To Strengthen the Maine Uniform Building and Energy Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Adopt Sas-372 To Cah-619 RC #352 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Accept Report RC #322 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Enactment - Mandate RC #294 (Y: 83 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Accept Report RC #322 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Enactment - Mandate RC #294 (Y: 83 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-20 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-372) thereto. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-372) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-372) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 352 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-372) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 294 (Yeas 83 - Nays 50 - Absent 17 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-18 | House | In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. |
2019-06-18 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-619) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 322 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2019-06-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-619). |
2019-06-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator Deschambault of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, in concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-04-16 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-02-14 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed. |