ME LD849 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Permanent the Telehealth Reimbursement Options Passed by Emergency Measures
Title
An Act To Make Permanent the Telehealth Reimbursement Options Passed by Emergency Measures
Sponsors
Rep. Kristi Mathieson [D] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Rep. Heidi Brooks [D] | Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] |
Rep. Melanie Sachs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=849&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0617&item=1&snum=130 |