ME LD849 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Application of the Public Works Minimum Wage Laws
Title
An Act To Clarify the Application of the Public Works Minimum Wage Laws
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Blodgett [D] | Rep. Herbert Clark [D] | Rep. Timothy Driscoll [D] | Rep. Paul Gilbert [D] |
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. John Tuttle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-12 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-12 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 247 (Yeas 113 - Nays 25 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) | |
2009-06-12 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-06-12 | (S) The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-241) | |
2009-06-12 | (S) Committee of Conference Report Accepted in concurrence Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 211 18 Yeas - 16 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2009-06-12 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-06-12 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Committee of Conference Report in concurrence (Remarks Made) | |
2009-06-12 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-06-11 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-06-11 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Report in concurrence (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered | |
2009-06-11 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-06-10 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-06-09 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-06-09 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Committee of Conference Report in concurrence (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered | |
2009-06-09 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ | |
2009-06-09 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-09 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 211 (Yeas 91 - Nays 52 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) | |
2009-06-09 | (H) COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-26 | (S) MILLS of Somerset | |
2009-05-26 | (S) DAMON of Hancock | |
2009-05-26 | (S) JACKSON of Aroostook | |
2009-05-26 | (S) The Chair appointed the following conferees on the part of the Senate: | |
2009-05-26 | (S) On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate INSISTED and JOINED in a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE Roll Call # 95 19 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2009-05-26 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-26 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook To INSIST and JOIN in a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE | |
2009-05-26 | (S) Senator JACKSON of Aroostook moved to INSIST and JOIN in a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE Roll Call Ordered | |
2009-05-21 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) On motion of Representative TUTTLE of Sanford, The House INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-241) and ASKED for a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. | |
2009-05-20 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-20 | (S) Subsequently Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2009-05-20 | (S) Motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook to ACCEPT Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-241) Report, in concurrence, FAILED (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 89 14 Yeas - 21 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2009-05-20 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-18 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-14 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-14 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-241) Report in concurrence | |
2009-05-14 | (S) Senator JACKSON of Aroostook moved to Accept Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-241) Report in concurrence | |
2009-05-14 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-05-13 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-13 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-241) | |
2009-05-13 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2009-05-13 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-241) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 68 (Yeas 89 - Nays 50 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered) | |
2009-05-12 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison TABLED pending the motion of Representative TUTTLE of Sanford to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Representative TUTTLE of Sanford moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR. | |
2009-03-05 | (H) Committee on Labor suggested and ordered printed. |