ME LD844 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 17 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Examine and Amend the Conditions of Release and Probation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Examine and Amend the Conditions of Release and Probation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #421 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #348 (Y: 82 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-19SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
2021-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-17SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) in concurrence
2021-06-17SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-704) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-17SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-17SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 421 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2021-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2021-06-17SenateReports READ
2021-06-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-17HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-704).
2021-06-17HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-17HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-704) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-17HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-17HouseROLL CALL NO. 348 (Yeas 82 - Nays 57 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
2021-06-17HouseOn motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-17HouseReports READ.
2021-06-16JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-05-27JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-05-27JointWork Session Reconsidered
2021-05-11JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-10SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2021-03-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-03-10HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2021-03-10HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback