ME LD842 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Create the Commission To Examine Reestablishing Parole

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Create the Commission To Examine Reestablishing Parole

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - House - Adopt Cah-717 Hah-736 & Hbh-743 RC #410 (Y: 72 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Adopt Hah-736 To Cah-717 RC #392 (Y: 85 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Recede RC #391 (Y: 82 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Rpt "b" Otp-b RC #448 (Y: 7 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-17 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #382 (Y: 83 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Recede RC #381 (Y: 79 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Acc Report 'b' Otp As Amend RC #367 (Y: 76 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-19SenateSubsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
2021-07-19SenateTAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE
2021-07-02SenateOn motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
2021-07-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-07-02HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2021-07-02SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-736) AND House Amendment "B" (H-743) thereto in concurrence
2021-07-01HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-07-01HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2021-07-01HouseSubsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-736) and House Amendment "B" (H-743) thereto.
2021-07-01HouseROLL CALL NO. 410 (Yeas 72 - Nays 47 - Absent 32 - Excused 0)
2021-07-01HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-717) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-736) and House Amendment "B" (H-743) thereto was ADOPTED.
2021-07-01HouseOn further motion of same Representative House Amendment "B" (H-743) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-07-01HouseOn further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-717).
2021-07-01HouseOn motion of Representative EVANGELOS of Friendship, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-717).
2021-07-01HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2021-06-30HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-30HouseLater today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
2021-06-30HouseOn motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
2021-06-30HouseRepresentative DILLINGHAM of Oxford REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED.
2021-06-30HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2021-06-30SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-736) thereto in concurrence
2021-06-30HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-30HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2021-06-30HouseSubsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-736) thereto.
2021-06-30HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-717) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-736) thereto was ADOPTED.
2021-06-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 392 (Yeas 85 - Nays 59 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
2021-06-30HouseOn motion of Representative EVANGELOS of Friendship, House Amendment "A" (H-736) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 391 (Yeas 82 - Nays 60 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
2021-06-30HouseOn motion of Representative EVANGELOS of Friendship, the House RECEDED.
2021-06-18SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-06-18SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Report C Ought Not To Pass ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2021-06-17HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-17HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2021-06-17HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-717).
2021-06-17HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-717) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-17HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-17HouseROLL CALL NO. 382 (Yeas 83 - Nays 49 - Absent 19 - Excused 0)
2021-06-17HouseOn motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-17HouseROLL CALL NO. 381 (Yeas 79 - Nays 55 - Absent 17 - Excused 0)
2021-06-17HouseThe House RECEDED.
2021-06-17SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Report C Ought Not To Pass ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2021-06-17SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 448 Yeas 7 - Nays 27 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-718) FAILED
2021-06-17SenateReports READ
2021-06-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-17HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-718).
2021-06-17HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-17HouseCommittee Amendment "B" (H-718) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-17HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-17HouseROLL CALL NO. 367 (Yeas 76 - Nays 62 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
2021-06-17HouseOn motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-17HouseReports READ.
2021-06-16JointReported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-05-11JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-05-11JointWork Session Reconsidered
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-10SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2021-03-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-03-10HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2021-03-10HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=842&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0610&item=1&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0610&item=2&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0610&item=7&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0610&item=10&snum=130
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN084202.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN084207.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN084210.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079302&chamber=House&serialnumber=367
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079302&chamber=House&serialnumber=381
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079302&chamber=House&serialnumber=382
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079302&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=448
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079302&chamber=House&serialnumber=391
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079302&chamber=House&serialnumber=392
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079302&chamber=House&serialnumber=410

Bill Comments 750

feedback