ME LD841 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Damages Awarded for Wrongful Death

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Damages Awarded for Wrongful Death

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-28HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-23SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-05-23SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-314), in concurrence.
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-314) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-23SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-05-23SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-23HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-314).
2019-05-23HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-05-23HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-02-14SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2019-02-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2019-02-14HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback