ME LD84 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the State Share of the Cost of Health Insurance for Retired Teachers
Title
An Act To Increase the State Share of the Cost of Health Insurance for Retired Teachers
Sponsors
Rep. William Faulkingham [R] | Rep. Gary Drinkwater [R] | Rep. Justin Fecteau [R] | Rep. Timothy Roche [R] |
Rep. Paul Stearns [R] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=84&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0050&item=1&snum=130 |