ME LD839 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Increase Funding for Multimodal Transportation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Increase Funding for Multimodal Transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #273 (Y: 61 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #164 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #150 (Y: 81 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2019-06-17HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-17HouseROLL CALL NO. 273V 61 having voted in the affirmative and 85 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
2019-06-17HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2019-06-04SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-03HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-30SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-329) in concurrence
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-329) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-30SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-30SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 164 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-05-30SenateOn motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED.
2019-05-30SenateReports Read
2019-05-29HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-29HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-329).
2019-05-29HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-29HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-329) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-29HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-29HouseROLL CALL NO. 150 (Yeas 81 - Nays 60 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-29HouseSubsequently, on motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-29HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-05-28HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-23HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-23HouseLater today assigned.
2019-05-23HouseOn motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2019-05-23HouseReports READ.
2019-02-14SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
2019-02-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2019-02-14HouseCommittee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback