ME LD839 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Address Substance Use and Addiction in County Jails
Title
Resolve, To Address Substance Use and Addiction in County Jails
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #148 (Y: 78 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-07 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-219). |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senator ROSEN of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-219). |
2017-05-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-219) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-24 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 148 (Yeas 78 - Nays 65 - Absent 6 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-24 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |