ME LD836 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal the Alternative Minimum Tax
Title
An Act To Repeal the Alternative Minimum Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD) | |
2011-05-26 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-23 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-154) in concurrence | |
2011-05-23 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-19 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY | |
2011-05-19 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-154) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-19 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-05-19 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Reports READ On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-154) Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-154) | |
2011-05-19 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-154) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 57 (Yeas 77 - Nays 69 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison TABLED pending the motion of Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) On motion by Senator Trahan of Lincoln, REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |