ME LD833 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Distribute Funds Received from the Racino in Bangor to the Department of Health and Human Services, Office of Substance Abuse
Title
An Act To Distribute Funds Received from the Racino in Bangor to the Department of Health and Human Services, Office of Substance Abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE | |
2010-04-02 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-02 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator SULLIVAN of York The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-785) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-791) thereto | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-03-31 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION | |
2010-03-31 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-785) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-791) thereto. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Subsequently, House Amendment "A" (H-785) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-791) thereto was ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) On further motion of same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-791) to House Amendment "A" (H-785) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) On further motion of same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-785) was READ. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) On further motion of same Representative, Committee Amendment "B" (H-613) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-635) to Committee Amendment "B" (H-613) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) On motion of Representative TRINWARD of Waterville, the House RECEDED. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) On motion of Representative PIOTTI of Unity, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-03-11 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-612) In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-03-11 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-03-11 | (S) On motion by Senator RAYE of Washington Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-612) In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-03-11 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-11 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-03-09 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-612) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-03-09 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-09 | (S) On motion by Senator SULLIVAN of York Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-612) Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 29920 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2010-03-09 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-02-25 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-02-25 | (S) On motion by Senator SULLIVAN of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT | |
2010-02-25 | (S) Reports READ | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-613) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-635) thereto. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Committee Amendment "B" (H-613) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-635) thereto ADOPTED. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) On motion of Representative VALENTINO of Saco, House Amendment "A" (H-635) to Committee Amendment "B" (H-613) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Committee Amendment "B" (H-613) was READ. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) On motion of Representative VALENTINO of Saco, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 265 (Yeas 33 - Nays 106 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) On motion of Representative PIOTTI of Unity TABLED pending the motion of Representative TUTTLE of Sanford to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Representative TUTTLE of Sanford moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-06-15 | (S) CARRIED OVER TO ANY SPECIAL OR REGULAR SESSION OF THE 124th LEGISLATURE PURSUANT TO JOINT ORDER HP 1053, IN CONCURRENCE | |
2009-06-13 | (H) Carried over to any special or regular session of the 124th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1053. | |
2009-03-03 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Sullivan of York, REFERRED to the Committee on LEGAL AND VETERANS AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-03-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-03 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LEGAL AND VETERANS AFFAIRS. | |
2009-03-03 | (H) Committee on Legal and Veterans Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |