ME LD830 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Maine Community College System to Study Providing On-campus Housing on All Campuses
Title
Resolve, Directing the Maine Community College System to Study Providing On-campus Housing on All Campuses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2023-05-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-11 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2023-05-09 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-05-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-05-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-03 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2023-05-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-05-03 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2023-05-03 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2023-04-04 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-04 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-28 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |