ME LD829 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Reestablish the Commission To Improve the Sentencing, Supervision, Management and Incarceration of Prisoners
Title
Resolve, To Reestablish the Commission To Improve the Sentencing, Supervision, Management and Incarceration of Prisoners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-20 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With the Bill PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-320) House Amendment "A" (H-659) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-309) in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-320), House Amendment "A" (H-659) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-309). |
2019-06-19 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-659) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative TALBOT ROSS of Portland, the House RECEDED. |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-320) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-659) thereto. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | FAILED FINAL PASSAGE In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-19 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-18 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-320) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-309). |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-320) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-309) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-309) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-320) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-320), in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-320) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-320). |
2019-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-14 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |