ME LD821 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Equity in Business Opportunity for Tobacco Specialty Stores
Title
An Act To Promote Equity in Business Opportunity for Tobacco Specialty Stores
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #325 (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #254 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #254 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-06-22 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-22 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-06-22 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-22 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2015-06-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 325 (Yeas 81 - Nays 63 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-22 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-22 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Majority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-262) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-17 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2015-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (S-262) READ and ADOPTED Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-262) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 254 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-11 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2015-03-10 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |