ME LD82 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - Voted: ONTP
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Provide for Participation of the State in the Planning and Negotiations for the Atlantic Loop Energy Project

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Provide for Participation of the State in the Planning and Negotiations for the Atlantic Loop Energy Project

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-03JointVoted: ONTP
2021-11-03JointWork Session Held
2021-07-19HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
2021-06-08JointCarry Over Approved
2021-06-08JointCarry Over Requested
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-18JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-04JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-01-11HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-01-11HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback