ME LD82 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Exempt Permanently Disabled Veterans from Payment of Property Tax
Title
An Act To Exempt Permanently Disabled Veterans from Payment of Property Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #112 (Y: 80 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #137 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #137 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-94). |
2017-05-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 112 (Yeas 80 - Nays 64 - Absent 5 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-17 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-94) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 137 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-01-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2017-01-11 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION |