ME LD82 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) 26 Yeas - 8 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - (S) 26 Yeas - 8 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing County Jail Budgeting for York County
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing County Jail Budgeting for York County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | (S) 26 Yeas - 8 Nays- 0 Excused - 1 Absent | |
2011-06-28 | (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 282 | |
2011-05-26 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-26 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-24 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-289) in concurrence | |
2011-05-24 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-23 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President Committee Amendment "A" (H-289) ADOPTED (Remarks Made) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-05-23 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-289) READ On motion by Senator HOBBINS of York Tabled Later Today Assigned pending ADOPTION OF Committee Amendment "A" (H-289) in concurrence | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-23 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-289) | |
2011-05-23 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-01-20 | (S) On motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Sent for concurrence. | |
2011-01-18 | (H) On motion of Representative COTTA of China, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. | |
2011-01-18 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-01-12 | (H) On motion of Representative COTTA of China, TABLED pending REFERENCE. | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed. |