ME LD816 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Provisions of the Law Concerning Municipal Inspections of Buildings
Title
An Act To Clarify Provisions of the Law Concerning Municipal Inspections of Buildings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-03 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2011-05-03 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-04-28 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2011-04-27 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-03-15 | (S) On motion by Senator RECTOR of Knox The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To REFERENCE to Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development | |
2011-03-10 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) The House INSISTED to REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator RECTOR of Knox REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY In NON-CONCURRENCE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-03 | (S) READ On motion by Senator RECTOR of Knox Tabled Later Today Assigned pending REFERENCE Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |