ME LD813 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure That Hospitals Comply with the Laws Governing Transparency of Medical Billing
Title
An Act To Ensure That Hospitals Comply with the Laws Governing Transparency of Medical Billing
Sponsors
Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Rep. Charles Kruger [D] | Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] |
Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Rep. Peter Stuckey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2015-03-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Subsequently, On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2015-03-10 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=813&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0287&item=1&snum=127 |