ME LD807 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Ensure Equitable Access to Mobile Hotspots for Maine Students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Ensure Equitable Access to Mobile Hotspots for Maine Students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2021-05-13JointReported Out: ONTP
2021-05-04JointVoted: ONTP
2021-05-04JointWork Session Held
2021-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-10HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-03-10HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2021-03-10SenateCommittee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback