ME LD807 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend Maine's Threatened and Endangered Species List
Title
An Act To Amend Maine's Threatened and Endangered Species List
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Joan Welsh [D] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] |
Rep. Robert Duchesne [D] | Rep. Jeffery Hanley [R] | Rep. Denise Harlow [D] | Rep. Dustin White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-05-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-90). |
2015-05-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-05-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-05-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-90) . |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-90) READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-11 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE |
2015-03-10 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE |