ME LD804 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Increase the Time Period for Notice to Terminate a Tenancy at Will
Title
An Act to Increase the Time Period for Notice to Terminate a Tenancy at Will
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-16 - House - Acc Rep A Ontp RC #257 (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Report A Ought Not To Pass ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 257 (Yeas 113 - Nays 30 - Absent 7 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, REPORT A Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM/OTP-AM |
2023-04-05 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-05 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2023-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |