ME LD800 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prevent Passage of Alewives through the Grand Falls Dam on the St. Croix River
Title
An Act To Prevent Passage of Alewives through the Grand Falls Dam on the St. Croix River
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - Ask Com Of Conf RC #11 (Y: 63 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-03-10 - House - Table Until Later RC #4 (Y: 75 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Table Until Later RC #4 (Y: 75 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator BAKER of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With REFERENCE to Committee on Marine Resources , in concurrence. |
2015-04-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 11 (Yeas 63 - Nays 82 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2015-04-02 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to ASK for a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE FAILED. |
2015-04-02 | House | The House INSISTED on REFERENCE to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator BAKER of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE , in concurrence. |
2015-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-19 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2015-03-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-03-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-10 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-03-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 4 (Yeas 75 - Nays 73 - Absent 2 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1) |
2015-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee on MARINE RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed. |