ME LD80 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide Critical Communications for Family Farms, Businesses and Residences by Strategic Public Investment in High-speed Internet and Broadband Infrastructure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide Critical Communications for Family Farms, Businesses and Residences by Strategic Public Investment in High-speed Internet and Broadband Infrastructure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-19HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
2021-06-03JointCarry Over Approved
2021-05-27JointCarry Over Requested
2021-04-01JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-02-18JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-01-11HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-01-11HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback