ME LD798 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect Maine Children and Students from Preventable Diseases by Repealing Certain Exemptions from the Laws Governing Immunization Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect Maine Children and Students from Preventable Diseases by Repealing Certain Exemptions from the Laws Governing Immunization Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Enactment RC #130 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Reconsider RC #131 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - House - Reconsider RC #106 (Y: 61 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - House - Enactment RC #105 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #96 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Recede And Concur RC #72 (Y: 65 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Indef Postpone Sas66 RC #80 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #79 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Adopt Hah-141 To Cah-120 RC #53 (Y: 64 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #52 (Y: 78 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-05-23SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 131 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-05-23SenateSenator BLACK of Franklin moved to RECONSIDER ENACTMENT FAILED
2019-05-23SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 130 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-05-23SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-21HouseROLL CALL NO. 106 (Yeas 61 - Nays 81 - Absent 6 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-21HouseSubsequently, the motion to RECONSIDER FAILED.
2019-05-21HouseRepresentative FECTEAU of Biddeford moved that the House RECONSIDER its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-21HouseHELD at the Request of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford.
2019-05-21HouseROLL CALL NO. 105 (Yeas 79 - Nays 62 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-21HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-21HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-05-16HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-16HouseLater today assigned.
2019-05-16HouseOn motion of Representative STEWART of Presque Isle, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-14SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 96 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-05-14SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-120) in concurrence
2019-05-14SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-05-09SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-09SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2019-05-08HouseRELEASED.
2019-05-07HouseHELD at the Request of Representative STEWART of Presque Isle.
2019-05-07HouseThe House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-120)
2019-05-07HouseROLL CALL NO. 72 (Yeas 65 - Nays 76 - Absent 8 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-05-07HouseMotion of Representative SAMPSON of Alfred to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED.
2019-05-02SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-05-02SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-120) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-66) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-120) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-66) thereto ADOPTED
2019-05-02SenateSenate Amendment "A" (S-66) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-120) ADOPTED
2019-05-02SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 80 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-05-02SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Senate Amendment "A" (S-66) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-120) FAILED
2019-05-02SenateOn motion by Senator MIRAMANT of Knox Senate Amendment "A" (S-66) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-120) READ
2019-05-02SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-120) READ
2019-05-02SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-02SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 79 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-05-02SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2019-05-02SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-04-30SenateUnfinished Business
2019-04-30SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
2019-04-30SenateSenator MILLETT of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-04-30SenateReports READ
2019-04-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-25HouseRELEASED.
2019-04-23HouseHELD at the Request of Representative STEWART of Presque Isle.
2019-04-23HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-120).
2019-04-23HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-04-23HouseSubsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (H-120) was ADOPTED.
2019-04-23HouseROLL CALL NO. 53 (Yeas 64 - Nays 72 - Absent 13 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-04-23HouseSubsequently, House Amendment "A" (H-141) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-120) FAILED ADOPTION.
2019-04-23HouseOn motion of Representative SAMPSON of Alfred, House Amendment "A" (H-141) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-120) was READ.
2019-04-23HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-120) was READ.
2019-04-23HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-04-23HouseROLL CALL NO. 52 (Yeas 78 - Nays 59 - Absent 12 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-04-23HouseOn motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-04-23HouseReports READ.
2019-02-12SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2019-02-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-12HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2019-02-12HouseCommittee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=798&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0586&item=1&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0586&item=2&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0586&item=5&snum=129
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071798&chamber=House&serialnumber=52
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071798&chamber=House&serialnumber=53
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071798&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=79
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071798&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=80
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071798&chamber=House&serialnumber=72
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071798&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=96
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071798&chamber=House&serialnumber=105
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071798&chamber=House&serialnumber=106
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071798&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=131
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071798&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=130

Bill Comments

feedback