ME LD795 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Voter Access to Information Regarding Referendum Questions on the Ballot
Title
An Act To Improve Voter Access to Information Regarding Referendum Questions on the Ballot
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Rep. Lawrence Lockman [R] | Rep. Stedman Seavey [R] |
Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] | Rep. Beth Turner [R] | Rep. Tom Winsor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-404), in concurrence. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-404) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-404). |
2017-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |