ME LD792 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Provide a Turnpike Gasoline Fairness Credit for Maine Turnpike Drivers
Title
An Act to Provide a Turnpike Gasoline Fairness Credit for Maine Turnpike Drivers
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Rep. Mana Abdi [D] | Rep. Randall Greenwood [R] | Rep. Laurel Libby [R] |
Rep. Richard Mason [R] | Rep. Kathleen Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-06-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-13 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-04-05 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-05 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |