ME LD792 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Funding for Transitional Housing for Women Veterans and Their Families
Title
An Act To Authorize Funding for Transitional Housing for Women Veterans and Their Families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - Enactment RC #105 (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #113 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #113 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 105 (Yeas 93 - Nays 50 - Absent 6 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-58), in concurrence. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-58) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 113 Yeas 31 - Nays 3 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-58). |
2017-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-58) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-04-25 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |