ME LD791 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Support the Maintenance, Preservation and Promotion of Historic Sites
Title
An Act to Support the Maintenance, Preservation and Promotion of Historic Sites
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-04-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-26). |
2023-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-04-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-26) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-26) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-04-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-04-13 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |