ME LD791 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Transparency and Improve Equity in Appeals to Superintendents' Agreements
Title
An Act To Increase Transparency and Improve Equity in Appeals to Superintendents' Agreements
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Devin [D] | Sen. Christopher Johnson [D] | Rep. Bruce Macdonald [D] | Rep. Ellen Winchenbach [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #280 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-414), in concurrence.. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-414) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-414) Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-414). |
2013-06-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-414) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 280 (Yeas 147 - Nays 0 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-11 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-10 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-10 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-10 | House | Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |