ME LD79 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect Shooting Ranges

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect Shooting Ranges

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-03-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-19HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-03-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith
2019-03-14SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
2019-03-14SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2019-03-12SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2019-03-12SenateREAD ONCE
2019-03-12SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2019-03-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2019-03-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-03-07HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-01-15SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence
2019-01-15HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-15HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
2019-01-15HouseCommittee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback