ME LD786 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Professional and Financial Regulation to Study Financial Incentives for Plumbing and Electrical Contractor Services
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Professional and Financial Regulation to Study Financial Incentives for Plumbing and Electrical Contractor Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-09 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-09 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-28 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |