ME LD786 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reduce Hunger and Promote Maine Agriculture
Title
An Act To Reduce Hunger and Promote Maine Agriculture
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - Enactment RC #317 (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 317 (Yeas 133 - Nays 10 - Absent 7 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-81) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-331) thereto. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-81) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-331) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-81) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-331) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-331) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-81) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-81) was ADOPTED |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-81) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-81). |
2019-05-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-81). |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-81) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-02-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |