ME LD785 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Safety and Traffic Efficiency near School Grounds
Title
An Act To Improve Safety and Traffic Efficiency near School Grounds
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Aaron Frey [D] | Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] |
Sen. Peter Lyford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-159) in concurrence |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-159) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-159). |
2017-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2017-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |