ME LD775 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Authorize the Department of Health and Human Services To Amend Its Rules for Eligibility for Community Support Services
Title
Resolve, To Authorize the Department of Health and Human Services To Amend Its Rules for Eligibility for Community Support Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-05 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-699) thereto in concurrence |
2020-02-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-27 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2020-02-27 | House | Subsequently, the RESOLVE was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-699) thereto. |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-699) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2020-02-27 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-699) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-02-27 | House | On further motion of the same Representative under further SUSPENSION of the RULES the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) was ADOPTED. |
2020-02-27 | House | On further motion of the same Representative under further SUSPENSION of the RULES the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the RESOLVE was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2020-02-27 | House | On motion of Representative GRAMLICH of Old Orchard Beach, under further SUSPENSION of the RULES, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the RESOLVE was FINALLY PASSED. |
2020-02-27 | House | Subsequently, the RULES were SUSPENDED for the purpose of RECONSIDERATION. |
2020-02-27 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2020-02-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2020-01-14 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending the motion to SUSPEND THE RULES. |
2020-01-14 | House | Representative GRAMLICH of Old Orchard Beach MOVED that the RULES BE SUSPENDED for the purpose of reconsideration. |
2020-01-14 | House | Bill RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1419) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently FINALLY PASSED in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) in concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-403). |
2019-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-03 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-03 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-03 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |