ME LD768 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Simplify Nonresident Hunting and Fishing Licenses
Title
An Act To Simplify Nonresident Hunting and Fishing Licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hilliard [R] | Sen. David Miramant [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. Bruce Bickford [R] |
Rep. Richard Bradstreet [R] | Rep. Lance Harvell [R] | Sen. Peter Lyford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2018-06-26 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-06-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2018-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-803) thereto in concurrence |
2018-06-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-25 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2018-06-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-803) thereto. |
2018-06-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-803) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2018-06-25 | House | On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-803) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-06-25 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-615). |
2018-06-25 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under further suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion of Representative HARLOW of Portland, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-25 | House | Bill RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1360) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) in concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-03-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-03-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-01 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-615). |
2018-03-01 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-01 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-03-01 | House | On motion of Representative DUCHESNE of Hudson, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence |
2017-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |