ME LD766 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Promote Telecommunications Availability for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing
Title
An Act To Promote Telecommunications Availability for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-65) in concurrence | |
2009-04-16 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-65) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-15 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-15 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-14 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-65) | |
2009-04-14 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-02-26 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Hobbins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on UTILITIES AND ENERGY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on UTILITIES AND ENERGY. | |
2009-02-26 | (H) Committee on Utilities and Energy suggested and ordered printed. |