ME LD765 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Review Asset Limits for Social Service Programs
Title
Resolve, To Review Asset Limits for Social Service Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-247), in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-247) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-16 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-247). |
2019-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-12 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |