ME LD764 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Limit the Exclusion of a Patient from Eligibility for an Organ Transplant Based on Medical Marijuana Use

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Limit the Exclusion of a Patient from Eligibility for an Organ Transplant Based on Medical Marijuana Use

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-09HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-08SenateOn motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-328) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-427) thereto in concurrence
2017-06-07HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-07HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2017-06-07HouseSubsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-328) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-427) thereto.
2017-06-07HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-328) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-427) thereto was ADOPTED.
2017-06-07HouseOn further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-427) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-328) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-07HouseOn further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-328).
2017-06-07HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-328).
2017-06-06HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-05HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-05HouseLater today assigned.
2017-06-05HouseOn motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-01SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-328) in concurrence
2017-06-01SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-328) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-01SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-01SenateOn motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2017-06-01SenateReports Read
2017-05-31HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-31HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-328).
2017-05-31HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-05-31HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-328) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-05-31HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-05-31HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-05-31HouseReports READ.
2017-03-02SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2017-03-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-03-02HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback