ME LD762 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Consent by a Motor Vehicle Operator to a Blood Test
Title
An Act Regarding Consent by a Motor Vehicle Operator to a Blood Test
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Enactment RC #298 (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #218 (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #139 (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #218 (Y: 12 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-28 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #139 (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To FAILED ENACTMENT In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | The House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Subsequently FAILED ENACTMENT In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | Subsequently, The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-284) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-198) thereto. |
2019-06-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-06-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-284) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-198) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-284) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-198) thereto ADOPTED |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Subsequently Senate Amendment "A" (S-198) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-284) ADOPTED |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2019-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "A" (S-198) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-284) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock Senate Amendment "A" (S-198) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-284) READ |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-284) READ |
2019-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 218 Yeas 12 - Nays 20 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec moved to TABLE FAILED |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York moved to Accept The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-284). |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-284) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 139 (Yeas 93 - Nays 47 - Absent 8 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-28 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-05-21 | House | On motion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford, TABLED pending the motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-21 | House | Representative WARREN of Hallowell moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2019-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |