ME LD759 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Efficiency and Effectiveness in the Licensing of Certain Health and Human Services Providers
Title
An Act To Increase Efficiency and Effectiveness in the Licensing of Certain Health and Human Services Providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-16 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-11 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-171) in concurrence | |
2011-05-11 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-10 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-05-10 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-171) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-171) | |
2011-05-05 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-03-01 | (S) On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |