ME LD757 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Labor Laws for Maine Workers
Title
An Act To Improve Labor Laws for Maine Workers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Enactment RC #71 (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #77 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #61 (Y: 78 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #77 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #61 (Y: 78 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 71 (Yeas 88 - Nays 54 - Absent 7 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) in concurrence |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 77 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-151). |
2019-04-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-30 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-04-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 61 (Yeas 78 - Nays 52 - Absent 19 - Excused 1 - Vacancy 1) |
2019-04-30 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2019-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |