ME LD756 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Clarify the Authority of an Affiliate of a Utility To Own Power Generation outside of the Utility's Territory

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Clarify the Authority of an Affiliate of a Utility To Own Power Generation outside of the Utility's Territory

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-28HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-28HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2017-06-27HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-23HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-22HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-21HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-20HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-19HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-16HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-15HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-14HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-13HouseUnfinished Business
2017-06-13HouseLater today assigned.
2017-06-13HouseOn motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-12HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-12HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-314) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-220) thereto.
2017-06-09SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-09SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-314) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-220) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-06-09SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-314) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-220) thereto ADOPTED
2017-06-09SenateOn motion by Senator WOODSOME of York Senate Amendment "A" (S-220) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-314) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-09SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-314) READ
2017-06-09SenateReport Accepted in concurrence
2017-06-09SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-06-08SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-05SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-01SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-31SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-31SenateOn motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Report
2017-05-31SenateReport READ
2017-05-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-30HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-314).
2017-05-30HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-05-30HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-03-02SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
2017-03-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2017-03-02HouseCommittee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback