ME LD756 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enhance the Address Confidentiality Program Regarding Property Records
Title
An Act To Enhance the Address Confidentiality Program Regarding Property Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-472), in concurrence. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-472) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-472) |
2015-06-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator Burns of Washington, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2015-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |