ME LD745 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-10-1)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-10-1)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Female Genital Mutilation
Title
An Act To Prohibit Female Genital Mutilation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-23 - House - Recede And Concur RC #382 (Y: 73 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Adopt Sbs-298 RC #365 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Disp Reading RC #364 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #324 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Recede And Concur RC #332 (Y: 69 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-16 - House - Table Until Later RC #331 (Y: 68 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - Acc Report 'b' Otp As Amend RC #308 (Y: 76 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Adopt Sbs-298 RC #365 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Disp Reading RC #364 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #324 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - House - Recede And Concur RC #332 (Y: 69 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-16 - House - Table Until Later RC #331 (Y: 68 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-06-13 - House - Acc Report 'b' Otp As Amend RC #308 (Y: 76 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2017-06-23 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-23 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-23 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-484). |
2017-06-23 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 382 (Yeas 73 - Nays 74 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-23 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-298) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-298) thereto ADOPTED |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 365 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Subsequently Senate Amendment "B" (S-298) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) was ADOPTED |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reading of Senate Amendment "B" (S-298) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) Dispensed with |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 364 Yeas 28 - Nays 6 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Objected to Dispensing wth the reading of Senate Amendment "B" (S-298) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-298) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) READ |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator MAKER of Washington The Senate RECEDED From PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2017-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-16 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-484). |
2017-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 332 (Yeas 69 - Nays 77 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-16 | House | Further motion of same Representative to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2017-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 331 (Yeas 68 - Nays 77 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-16 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to TABLE until later in today's session FAILED. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 324 Yeas 25 - Nays 10 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Subsequently Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass as Amended , as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-483) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senator ROSEN of Hancock moved to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass as Amended . |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-484). |
2017-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "B" (H-484) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 308 (Yeas 76 - Nays 71 - Absent 3 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-13 | House | Subsequently, REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending the motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell to ACCEPT REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended |
2017-06-13 | House | Representative WARREN of Hallowell moved to ACCEPT REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended |
2017-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2017-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-03-07 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-03-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-03-02 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-03-02 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed. |