ME LD734 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Expedite the Processing of Applications for Certification under the Federal Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Title
Resolve, To Expedite the Processing of Applications for Certification under the Federal Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-51), in concurrence. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-51) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2019-04-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-02 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-51). |
2019-04-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-51) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-02 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2019-04-02 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2019-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-12 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |