ME LD733 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Promote Keeping Workers in Maine

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Promote Keeping Workers in Maine

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #200 (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Adopt Sas-208 To Cah-280 RC #199 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #121 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-19HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-19HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-19HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) as Amended by Senate Amendments "A" (S-208) and "B" (S-330) thereto.
2019-06-19SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-208) AND Senate Amendment "B" (S-330) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-19SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-280) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-330) thereto ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-330) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) was ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-208) thereto
2019-06-19SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-06-10SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-07HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-06HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-208) thereto.
2019-06-05SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 200 Yeas 29 - Nays 6 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-05SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-208) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-05SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-280) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-208) thereto ADOPTED
2019-06-05SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 199 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-05SenateOn motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-208) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-280) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-05SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-04SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-03SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-30SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-29SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-28SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-23SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-23SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-280)
2019-05-23SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-23SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 121 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-05-23SenateOn motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-05-23SenateReports Read
2019-05-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-21HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-280).
2019-05-21HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-21HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-280) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-21HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-21HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-21HouseReports READ.
2019-02-12SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
2019-02-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-12HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2019-02-12HouseCommittee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=733&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0538&item=1&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0538&item=2&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0538&item=4&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0538&item=6&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0538&item=7&snum=129
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071707&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=121
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071707&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=199
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071707&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=200

Bill Comments

feedback